This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 11:07:47 (UTC).

Taylor v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Taylor filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aubrey Taylor

Atwater, CA 95301

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

US Attorney Habeas

Catherine L Crisham

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

Rebecca Shapiro Cohen

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court will GRANT petitioner's "Supplemental Request of Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 Motion" (Dkt. #6 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminatethe above captioned matter and to refile petitioners "Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 / Napue Violations / Brady Violations / Prosecutorial Misconduct Motion to Vacate Convictions and Dismiss Superseding Indictment (Second)" (Dkt. #1 ) under case number CR16-300RSL as a Rule 33 Motion for New Trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government's "Motion to Stay" the proceedings in the above captioned matter (Dkt. #5 ) be DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (cc: Petitioner via USPS on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Convert Civil Action to a Motion Pursuant to FRCrP 33 Under Case Number 16cr300, filed by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor. Noting Date 8/7/2020 (MW) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay , filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Crisham, Catherine) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) DISREGARD per counsel, filed in error RESPONSE, by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crisham, Catherine) Modified per counsel request, will refile with correct event on 7/6/2020 (STP). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#3

(#3) LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS on 7/1/2020) (ST) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) 2255 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, filed by Aubrey Taylor. Related to criminal case: 16-cr-999-RSL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court will GRANT petitioner's "Supplemental Request of Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 Motion" (Dkt. #6 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminatethe above captioned matter and to refile petitioners "Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 / Napue Violations / Brady Violations / Prosecutorial Misconduct Motion to Vacate Convictions and Dismiss Superseding Indictment (Second)" (Dkt. #1 ) under case number CR16-300RSL as a Rule 33 Motion for New Trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government's "Motion to Stay" the proceedings in the above captioned matter (Dkt. #5 ) be DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (cc: Petitioner via USPS on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Convert Civil Action to a Motion Pursuant to FRCrP 33 Under Case Number 16cr300, filed by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor. Noting Date 8/7/2020 (MW) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 RESPONSE, by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor: Per counsel, filed with incorrect event, refiled as docket #5 . (STP) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay , filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Crisham, Catherine) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISREGARD per counsel, filed in error RESPONSE, by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crisham, Catherine) Modified per counsel request, will refile with correct event on 7/6/2020 (STP). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS on 7/1/2020) (ST) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 2255 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, filed by Aubrey Taylor. Related to criminal case: 16-cr-999-RSL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less