This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:36:10 (UTC).

Taylor v. Third Century Development Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Taylor filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Third Century Development Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-25012

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRENCE TAYLOR

Defendants

BETTY D WALKER

Third Century Development Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Monica Espino

Attorney at Espino Law, P.L.

2655 S Le Jeune Road, Suite 802

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Henry Hernandez

2655 S. Lejeune Road, Suite 802

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

John Bradley Agnetti

Attorney at Hoffman Larin & Agnetti

909 N Miami Beach Boulevard, Suite 201

North Miami Beach, FL 33162-3712

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BETTY D WALKER. (kpe) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#25

(#25) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Third Century Development Corporation. (kpe) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Answers to the Amended Complaint Out of Time. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#23

(#23) Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Answers to Amended Complaint Out of Time by Third Century Development Corporation, BETTY D WALKER. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#22

(#22) VACATED Clerks Entry of Default as to Third Century Development Corporation, Betty D. Walker per #21 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/28/2020. (kpe) Modified on 1/29/2020 per DE #24 Order (kpe). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#21

(#21) Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default as to Third Century Development Corporation, BETTY D WALKER. ( Motions due by 2/11/2020.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#20

(#20) Defendant's RESPONSE to Statement of Claim (Cherry Village) by Third Century Development Corporation. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#19

(#19) Defendant's RESPONSE to Statement of Claim (Betty Walker) by BETTY D WALKER. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Third Century Development Corporation. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TERRENCE TAYLOR. BETTY D WALKER served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TERRENCE TAYLOR. Third Century Development Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 1/10/2020, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#8) Statement of: Claim by TERRENCE TAYLOR re #4 Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Set/Reset Deadlines (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Third Century Development Corporation, BETTY D WALKER. (kpe) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TERRENCE TAYLOR. BETTY D WALKER served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BETTY D WALKER. (kpe) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Third Century Development Corporation. (kpe) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Answers to the Amended Complaint Out of Time. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Answers to Amended Complaint Out of Time by Third Century Development Corporation, BETTY D WALKER. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) VACATED Clerks Entry of Default as to Third Century Development Corporation, Betty D. Walker per #21 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/28/2020. (kpe) Modified on 1/29/2020 per DE #24 Order (kpe). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default as to Third Century Development Corporation, BETTY D WALKER. ( Motions due by 2/11/2020.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Defendant's RESPONSE to Statement of Claim (Cherry Village) by Third Century Development Corporation. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Defendant's RESPONSE to Statement of Claim (Betty Walker) by BETTY D WALKER. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Third Century Development Corporation. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by BETTY D WALKER. (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bradley Agnetti on behalf of Third Century Development Corporation. Attorney John Bradley Agnetti added to party Third Century Development Corporation(pty:dft). (Agnetti, John) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of: Claim by TERRENCE TAYLOR re #4 Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Set/Reset Deadlines (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TERRENCE TAYLOR. BETTY D WALKER served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TERRENCE TAYLOR. Third Century Development Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 1/10/2020, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND REFERRAL IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT. ( Statement of Claim due by 1/24/2020.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Third Century Development Corporation, BETTY D WALKER. (kpe) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THIRD CENTURY DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION D/B/A CHERRY VILLAGE APARTMENTS, BETTY D WALKER. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12202336, filed by TERRENCE TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Hernandez, Henry) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.