This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 07:59:12 (UTC).

Taylor v. Phillipellie

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Taylor filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Phillipellie. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jackie Taylor

Newton, IA 50208

Defendant

Phillipellie

Interested Party

William A Hill

Des Moines, IA 50319

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Letter from Jackie Taylor. (slg) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to file amended petition on or before November 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/22/2019. (ptb) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jackie Taylor. (kjw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Phillipellie, filed by Jackie Taylor. (kjw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jackie Taylor. See docket entry #4 for image. Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 12/4/2019. (slg) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Jackie Taylor. (slg) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting permission to proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to file amended petition on or before November 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/22/2019. (ptb) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Judge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner no longer assigned to case. (kjw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jackie Taylor. (kjw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Phillipellie, filed by Jackie Taylor. (kjw) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.