This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/09/2022 at 08:14:32 (UTC).

Taylor v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Omni Hotels Management Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04057

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmin Taylor

Defendant

Omni Hotels Management Corporation doing business as Omni Hotel CNN Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamara Edward Shipp

Defendant Attorneys

C. Stephen Setliff

Eli Jason Mackey

James E. Gilson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal State

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/12/2022. (tas) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. Discovery ends on 3/16/2023.(Gilson, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Omni Hotels Corporation for Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to C. Stephen Setliff. Clerk to follow-up by 10/31/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Eli Jason Mackey. Clerk to follow-up by 10/31/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff Stipulation as to Damages

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 Stipulation to Remand filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. It is hereby ORDERED that this action be remanded to the Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/18/2022. (tas) Modified on 11/21/2022 to edit docket text (tas). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Electronic Transmittal of Certified #12 Order Granting Remand to the Superior Court of Fulton County. (tas) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

DocketCivil Case Terminated. (tas) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #11 Stipulation to Remand filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. It is hereby ORDERED that this action be remanded to the Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/18/2022. (tas) Modified on 11/21/2022 to edit docket text (tas). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Remand by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Stipulation as to Damages)(Moulton, Scott) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eli Jason S. Mackey. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles Stephen Setliff. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Eli Jason S. Mackey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12165588).. Attorney Eli Jason Mackey added appearing on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation (cdg) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles Stephen Setliff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12165544). Attorney C. Stephen Setliff added appearing on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation (cdg) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Eli Jason S. Mackey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12165588).by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Gilson, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 10/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Charles Stephen Setliff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12165544).by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Gilson, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 10/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Eli Jason Mackey. Clerk to follow-up by 10/31/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to C. Stephen Setliff. Clerk to follow-up by 10/31/2022. (cdg) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Omni Hotels Corporation for Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. Discovery ends on 3/16/2023.(Gilson, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/12/2022. (tas) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12120777) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal State, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less