This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2022 at 07:33:11 (UTC).

Taylor v. Newell Brands, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Newell Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jason K. Pulliam and Elizabeth S. Chestney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-01056

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawanna Taylor

Defendants

Newell Brands, Inc.

SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. doing business as Jarden Consumer Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew S. Bullard

Attorney at Payne Mitchell Law Group

3500 Maple Avenue Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75219

James Lee Mitchell

Attorney at Payne Mitchell Law Group

3500 Maple Avenue - Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Darby Vincent Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Rd, Ste 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Kyle Randall Akin

Attorney at Haltom and Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16570593), filed by Lawanna Taylor.(Mitchell, James) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Affidavit

#3

(#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Lawanna Taylor. (Mitchell, James) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Newell Brands, Inc., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (mgr) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Darby Vincent Doan added to party Newell Brands, Inc.(pty:dft) by Newell Brands, Inc..(Doan, Darby) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Darby Vincent Doan added to party Sunbeam Products, Inc.(pty:dft) by Sunbeam Products, Inc..(Doan, Darby) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Parties by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Doan, Darby) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Parties by Newell Brands, Inc., Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Doan, Darby) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Darby Vincent Doan added to party Sunbeam Products, Inc.(pty:dft) by Sunbeam Products, Inc..(Doan, Darby) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Darby Vincent Doan added to party Newell Brands, Inc.(pty:dft) by Newell Brands, Inc..(Doan, Darby) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Newell Brands, Inc., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (mgr) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Lawanna Taylor. (Mitchell, James) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lawanna Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mitchell, James) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16570593), filed by Lawanna Taylor.(Mitchell, James) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Newell Brands DTC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darby Vincent Doan