This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:58:36 (UTC).

Taylor v. Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lance M Africk, Donna Phillips Currault, Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00301

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lance M Africk

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Referral Judges

Donna Phillips Currault

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hugh A. Taylor

Defendants

Exxon Mobil Corporation

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation

Marathon Petroleum Company LP

Crane Co.

Air Products and Chemicals, Inc.

Anco Insulations, Inc.

ViacomCBS Inc

General Electric Company

Foster Wheeler LLC

Energy Transfer (R&M) LLC

El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company

E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company

Entergy Louisiana, LLC

Entergy New Orleans, LLC

Honeywell International Inc.

Goodrich Corporation

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Occidental Chemical Corporation

CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerolyn Petit Roussel

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Benjamin Peter Dinehart

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Defendant Attorneys

John Allain Viator

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco & Viator, LLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Melissa Jade Shaffer

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Erin Brooke Rigsby

Attorney at Chehardy Sheman Williams, LLP

1 Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Inemesit U. O'Boyle

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

James McClendon Williams

Attorney at Chehardy, Sherman, Williams, Murray, Recile, Stakelum, & Hay

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Patrick R Follette

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Thomas Clay Naquin

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator & Holinga APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Thomas J. Cortazzo

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois New Orleans

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Shannon C. Burr

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Susan Grace Keller-Garcia

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Thorne D. Harris, III

Attorney at Thorne D. Harris III, Attorney at Law

3350 Ridgelake Dr., Suite 101

Metairie, LA 70002

Other Attorneys

Margaret M. Joffe

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

92 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#56

(#56) ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that Darryl M. Phillips of Entergy Services, Inc. is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for defendant Entergy Louisiana, LLC in the above- captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 4/7/2022. (pp) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

55 #1

Proposed Order

55 #55

Main Document

#54

(#54) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#53

(#53) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#52

(#52) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hexion, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hexion Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Hexion Intermediate Holdings 2, Inc., Corporate Parent Hexion Intermediate Holdings 1, Inc. for Hexion, Inc. (Redmann, David) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#51

(#51) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation . (Cahn, Cory) Modified text on 4/1/2022 (pp). (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#50

(#50) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ViacomCBS Inc identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#49

(#49) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster-Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster-Wheeler LLC (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

1 #12

Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties

1 #10

Exhibit C

1 #9

Exhibit B-2

1 #7

Exhibit A part 7 of 7

1 #6

Exhibit A part 6 of 7

1 #5

Exhibit A part 5 of 7

1 #3

Exhibit A part 3 of 7

1 #2

Exhibit A part 2 of 7

#1

(#6) Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Viator, John) Modified link/text on 2/28/2022 (pp). (Entered: 02/25/2022)

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that Darryl M. Phillips of Entergy Services, Inc. is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for defendant Entergy Louisiana, LLC in the above- captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 4/7/2022. (pp) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Darryl M. Phillips as Counsel of Record by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cahn, Cory) Modified text on 4/7/2022 (pp). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG, Corporate Parent Bayer CropScience Holding SA for Bayer CropScience, Inc. (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hexion, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hexion Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Hexion Intermediate Holdings 2, Inc., Corporate Parent Hexion Intermediate Holdings 1, Inc. for Hexion, Inc. (Redmann, David) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C identifying Corporate Parent Entergy Corporation . (Cahn, Cory) Modified text on 4/1/2022 (pp). (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ViacomCBS Inc identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster-Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster-Wheeler LLC (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Puente-Martin, Magali) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of re #29 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hugh A. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(pp) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Honeywell International Inc. (Whalen, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company identifying Corporate Parent Corteva Inc. for E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company (Ziffer, Lee) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Parties are to call in to the conference at the number listed in the Notice. Issued by Clerk. (dw) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Viator, John) Modified link/text on 2/28/2022 (pp). (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL - IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this Court. Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 2/14/2022. (Mag. 1) (sa) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(pp) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/10/2022.(ko) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2021-06263 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9218283) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 of 7, #2 Exhibit A part 2 of 7, #3 Exhibit A part 3 of 7, #4 Exhibit A part 4 of 7, #5 Exhibit A part 5 of 7, #6 Exhibit A part 6 of 7, #7 Exhibit A part 7 of 7, #8 Exhibit B-1, #9 Exhibit B-2, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney John Allain Viator added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Allain Viator added to party ExxonMobil Oil Corporation(pty:dft).(Viator, John) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association is a litigant

Latest cases where CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. is a litigant