This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:47:39 (UTC).

Taylor v. Daseke, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Daseke, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04407

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vera Taylor

Petitioner and Cross Claimant

California Casualty Indemnity Exchange

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Glenn McIntyre

Daseke, Inc.

Hornady Transportation, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Ryan Abrego

Attorney at The Abrego Law Firm, LLC

1040 Crown Pointe Parkway, Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30338-7701

Sheryl L. Burke

Attorney at Law Offices of Sheryl L. Burke

1137 Ponce De Leon Avenue

Atlanta, GA 30306

Petitioner and Cross Claimant Attorney

Bradley S. Wolff

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Blair Joseph Cash

Attorney at Moseley Marcinak Law Group, LLP

P.O. Box 1688

Kennesaw, GA 30156

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Substituting Defendant

#17

#16

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B to Brief

1 #2

Exhibit A to Brief

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Glenn McIntyre.(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Substitute Party. Hornady Transportation, LLC added. Daseke, Inc. and Daseke, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/21/2020. (dob) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Daseke, Inc.by Daseke, Inc., Glenn McIntyre. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Substituting Defendant)(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice, terminating California Casualty Indemnity Exchange with expressed conditioned upon the terms and conditions set forth in the written ConsentMotion and Agreement between Plaintiff Vera Taylor and California CasualtyIndemnity Exchange pursuant to the Courts authority under Fed.R.Civ.P. 21. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/15/2020. (dob) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice UM Carrier Only by California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, California Casualty Indemnity Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Bradley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Initial Disclosures by Vera Taylor.(Abrego, Christopher) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Daseke, Inc., Glenn McIntyre.(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan This case is assignedto an eight-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on orbefore August 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/23/2020. (jta) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Glenn McIntyre. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim of California Casualty Indemnity Exchange by Daseke, Inc., Glenn McIntyre.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons by California Casualty Indemnity Exchange. (Wolff, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daseke, Inc. by Daseke, Inc..(Cash, Blair) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Glenn McIntyre.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/6/2020 to add applicable link (dob). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Daseke, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/6/2020 to add applicable link(dob). (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (ddm) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 3/29/2021.), CROSSCLAIM against Daseke, Inc., Glenn McIntyre with Jury Demand by California Casualty Indemnity Exchange.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Glenn McIntyre, Daseke, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-10315225) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Brief, #5 Exhibit D to Brief, #6 Exhibit E to Brief, #7 Exhibit F to Brief, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORNADY TRANSPORTATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Daseke Management Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley S. Wolff(Designation Retained)