This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2022 at 08:38:40 (UTC).

TAYLOR v. CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 TAYLOR filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CONAGRA BRANDS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00895

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORENZO S. TAYLOR, SR.

Indianapolis, IN 46254

Defendant

CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Hillary L. Klein

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

736 Georgia Avenue, Suite 300

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Scott D. Meyers

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

John W. Borkowski

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

120 S. Riverside Plaza, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER - Pro se Plaintiff Lorenzo S. Taylor, Sr. has filed a "Motion to Court for Hearing Date," #14 , in which he asks the Court to set a hearing regarding his claims. Mr. Taylor's Motion is DENIED. This case will proceed along the typical civil case schedule, and to that end, the Court has already scheduled a telephonic initial pretrial conference for July 11, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. Mr. Taylor should receive (if he has not already received) an "Order Setting Pro Se Initial Pre-Trial Conference" issued by the Court on May 19, 2022. This Order contains instructions for how to call-in to the conference. During the July 11, 2022 telephone conference, the Court will discuss the issues identified in the "Order Setting Pro Se Initial Pre-Trial Conference." Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/26/2022. (NAD) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Court for Hearing Date, filed by Plaintiff LORENZO S. TAYLOR, SR. (AKH) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Pro Se Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2022 at 2:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The parties shall attend the conference by using the following call-in information: 888-363-4734, Access Code 1125419, Security Code 220895. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/19/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Scott D. Meyers for CONAGRA BRANDS, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/17/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Hillary L. Klein for CONAGRA BRANDS, INC. added (See marginal entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/17/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by CONAGRA BRANDS, INC..(Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#7

(#7) **PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR** NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) Modified on 5/11/2022 (AKH). (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Borkowski on behalf of Defendant CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Plaintiff, filed by Defendant CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Record Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER - Pro se Plaintiff Lorenzo S. Taylor, Sr. has filed a "Motion to Court for Hearing Date," #14 , in which he asks the Court to set a hearing regarding his claims. Mr. Taylor's Motion is DENIED. This case will proceed along the typical civil case schedule, and to that end, the Court has already scheduled a telephonic initial pretrial conference for July 11, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. Mr. Taylor should receive (if he has not already received) an "Order Setting Pro Se Initial Pre-Trial Conference" issued by the Court on May 19, 2022. This Order contains instructions for how to call-in to the conference. During the July 11, 2022 telephone conference, the Court will discuss the issues identified in the "Order Setting Pro Se Initial Pre-Trial Conference." Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/26/2022. (NAD) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Court for Hearing Date, filed by Plaintiff LORENZO S. TAYLOR, SR. (AKH) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Pro Se Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2022 at 2:30 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. The parties shall attend the conference by using the following call-in information: 888-363-4734, Access Code 1125419, Security Code 220895. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/19/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Scott D. Meyers for CONAGRA BRANDS, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/17/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Hillary L. Klein for CONAGRA BRANDS, INC. added (See marginal entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 5/17/2022 Copy sent to Mr. Taylor via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott D. Meyers to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7105240), filed by Defendant CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Borkowski, John) Modified on 5/17/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Attorney(s) Hilary L. Klein to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7105239), filed by Defendant CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Borkowski, John) Modified on 5/17/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by CONAGRA BRANDS, INC..(Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR** NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) Modified on 5/11/2022 (AKH). (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (AKH) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Borkowski on behalf of Defendant CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE to Plaintiff, filed by Defendant CONAGRA BRANDS, INC., re #1 Notice of Removal. (Borkowski, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Marion County, Indiana, case number 49D112204CC010931, filed by CONAGRA BRANDS, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7091658) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Docket Sheet; Appearance; Complaint; Summons; Service; Certified Mail Returned; Letter to Court from Plaintiff), #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borkowski, John) Modified on 5/16/2022 - deleted duplicate docket text (AKH). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Daniel Meyers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W Borkowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hillary L Klein