This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:46:27 (UTC).

Taylor v. Colorado Justice Department et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Taylor filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Colorado Justice Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02472

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Taylor

Canon City, CO 81215-0777

Defendants

Zeyen Wu

Colorado Justice Department

Jason Dunn

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER Denying #2 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Mr. Taylor shall pay $400.00 ($350.00 filing fee, plus a $50.00 administrative fee) within thirty (30) days from the date of this order if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Mr. Taylor fails to pay the full amount of $400.00 within the time allowed, the complaint and the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 25, 2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: That Mr. Taylor show cause in writing within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why leave to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied because he is subject to the filing restriction in 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). That if Mr. Taylor fails to show good cause within the time allowed, he will be denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Christopher Taylor. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Letter

#1

(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Colorado Justice Department, Jason Dunn, Zeyen Wu, filed by Christopher Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(trvo, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Denying #2 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Mr. Taylor shall pay $400.00 ($350.00 filing fee, plus a $50.00 administrative fee) within thirty (30) days from the date of this order if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Mr. Taylor fails to pay the full amount of $400.00 within the time allowed, the complaint and the action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 25, 2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: That Mr. Taylor show cause in writing within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why leave to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied because he is subject to the filing restriction in 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). That if Mr. Taylor fails to show good cause within the time allowed, he will be denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Christopher Taylor. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Colorado Justice Department, Jason Dunn, Zeyen Wu, filed by Christopher Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(trvo, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less