This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 12:43:21 (UTC).

Taylor v. CHAT-TN, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Taylor filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CHAT-TN, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles E Atchley, Jr and Susan K Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles E Atchley, Jr

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tawanna Taylor

Defendant

CHAT-TN, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

R Scott Jackson, Jr

Attorney at R Scott Jackson, Attorney at Law

4525 Harding Road, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37205

John Robert McCown

Attorney at Warren & Griffin, PC

300 West Emery Street, Suite 108

Dalton, GA 30720

Defendant Attorney

Gary Lionel Henry

Attorney at Law Office of Gary L. Henry

Post Office Box 23115

Chattanooga, TN 37422-3115

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons Chatt-TN, LLC

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CHAT-TN, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/13/22. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/13/22. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/13/22. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Lionel Henry on behalf of All Defendants (Henry, Gary) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tawanna Taylor. CHAT-TN, LLC served on 4/19/2022. (McCown, John) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CHAT-TN, LLC.(Henry, Gary) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CHAT-TN, LLC. (Henry, Gary) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#11

(#11) ORDER: Scheduling Conference is set for 5/31/2022 01:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr.. On or before May 24, 2022, the parties shall file a report outlining their discovery plan. The report must comply in all respects with Rule 26(f)(3).Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/12/2022. (BJL) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, R) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal Case without prejudice by Tawanna Taylor. (Jackson, R) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal Case without prejudice by Tawanna Taylor. (Jackson, R) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, R) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/24/2022. (BJL) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Scheduling Conference is set for 5/31/2022 01:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr.. On or before May 24, 2022, the parties shall file a report outlining their discovery plan. The report must comply in all respects with Rule 26(f)(3).Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/12/2022. (BJL) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by CHAT-TN, LLC. (Henry, Gary) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CHAT-TN, LLC.(Henry, Gary) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tawanna Taylor. CHAT-TN, LLC served on 4/19/2022. (McCown, John) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Lionel Henry on behalf of All Defendants (Henry, Gary) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/13/22. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/13/22. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 4/13/22. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CHAT-TN, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Tawanna Taylor against CHAT-TN, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5032754.), filed by Tawanna Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons Chatt-TN, LLC, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(McCown, John) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less