This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:38:55 (UTC).

Taylor v. Chase Bank USA N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 Taylor filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Chase Bank USA N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Edmund F. Brennan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00629

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Barry Taylor

Defendant

Chase Bank USA N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Frederick Cardoza

Lauren Brooks Veggian

Defendant Attorneys

Kurt A. Kappes

Michael Dominick Lane

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Declaration

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Consent Form

4 #2

VDRP

#5

#6

6 #1

Proof of Service

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/17/2019 APPROVING the parties' Stipulation to Amend the Initial Scheduling Order (ECF No. #8 ). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN to Amend the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by Michael Barry Taylor. (Veggian, Lauren) Modified on 6/17/2019 (Becknal, R). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED EVENT. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (Huang, H) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lauren Brooks Veggian on behalf of Michael Barry Taylor. Attorney Veggian, Lauren Brooks added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Veggian, Lauren) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/17/2019 GRANTING #2 Request to Seal Documents. (Huang, H) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Washington, S) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Chase Bank USA N.A.. (Kappes, Kurt) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Chase Bank USA N.A.. (Lane, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2018-00227141 by Chase Bank USA N.A. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8210151) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lane, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less