This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:47:25 (UTC).

Taylor Thompson v. Robinhood Financial LLC

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Taylor Thompson filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Robinhood Financial LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23026

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor Thompson

Defendant

Robinhood Financial LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul R. Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2910

Richard Collins Dalton

Attorney at Richard C. Dalton, LLC

P.O. Box 358

Carencro, LA 70520

Edward S. Zusman

Attorney at Markun Zusman Freniere and Compton LLP

465 California Street, Suite 401

San Francisco, CA 94104

Cherisse H. Cleofe

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Blvd.

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Jeffrey A. Koncius

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

David S. Markun

Attorney at Markun Zusman and Compton LLP

17383 West Sunset Boulevard Suite A380

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin J. Orsini

Attorney at Cravath Swaine and Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Naeun Rim

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Antony L. Ryan

Attorney at Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019-7475

Brittany L. Sukiennik

Attorney at Cravath Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Grace Kang

Attorney at Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg and Rhow

1875 Century Park East 23Rd Floor

Los Angeles,, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#40

37 #1

*Restricted*

37 #37

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#36

#35

#33

24 #2

Proposed Order

24 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey A. Koncius

24 #24

Main Document

8 #8

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A; copies of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon Robinhood in

1 #1

Main Document

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#39) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:21-cv-02230 with documents 1-36. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-23026-CMA Taylor Thompson v. Robinhood Financial LLC. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA (mc) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#38) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-02230. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2989, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Briefing on Motion to Vacate the Conditional Transfer Order Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC. (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff Taylor Thompson's Motion to Remand #24 set for May 3, 2021, is hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance will be necessary. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Briefing Schedule for Conditional Transfer Order filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC. (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) SUPPORTING AUTHORITY FROM LEXIS CITED IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #24 filed by Plaintiff Taylor Thompson. (Cleofe, Cherisse) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) DECLARATION of Cherisse H. Cleofe in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #24 (Declaration of Cherisse H. Cleofe in support of Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court) filed by Plaintiff Taylor Thompson. (Cleofe, Cherisse) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/11/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-30904319) filed by Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Antony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30904333) filed by Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to an Agreed Upon Date filed by defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Grace W. Kang counsel for Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. Adding Grace W. Kang as counsel of record for Robinhood Financial LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC. (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Grace W. Kang counsel for Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. Adding Naeun Rim as counsel of record for Robinhood Financial LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robinhood Financial LLC. (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Kang, Grace) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, identifying Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Attorney Grace W. Kang added to party ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC(pty:dft))(Kang, Grace) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. Related Case(s): 21-CV-00835-VAP(MRW); and 21-CV-00837-VAP(MRW)] (Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV04909 Receipt No: ACACDC-30903184 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; copies of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon Robinhood in the State Court Action) (Attorney Naeun Rim added to party ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC(pty:dft))(Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Lynn Sukiennik

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antony L Ryan