This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2022 at 07:06:57 (UTC).

Fiffie v. Eagle, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 Fiffie filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Eagle, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00189

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.

Hopeman Brothers Inc

International Paper Company

McCarty Corporation

Uniroyal Holding, Inc.

Anco Insulations Inc

Garlock, Inc

Goulds Pumps LLC

Grinnell Corporation

Occidental Petroleum Corporation

Chevron USA Inc

Albert L. Bossier Jr.

John David Roberts

American Motorists Insurance Company

CBS / Viacom / Westinghouse

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated/Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.

Union Carbide

Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Other Attorneys

Caleb Didriksen

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Carl Allen Woods, III

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Erin B. Saucier

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Angelica Petrovna Dubinsky

Attorney at Shields Law Partners, LLP

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Christopher Thomas Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Whitney Charmaine Stewart

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP

3421 N Causeway Blvd, Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn for Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 03/25/2022. (am) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#11

(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #4 Complaint to Huntington Ingalls Cross Claims by Bayer CropScience.Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience (pty:dft).(Stein, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #4 Complaint to Huntington Ingalls Cross Claims by Union Carbide Corporation.(Stein, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint to Albert Albert Bossier's Cross Claims by Union Carbide Corporation.Attorney David M. Stein added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(Stein, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross Claim by Eagle, Inc.(McQuillar, April) Modified text on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

5 #1

Proposed Order

4 #7

State Court Pleadings Part 7

4 #6

State Court Pleadings Part 6

4 #5

State Court Pleadings Part 5

4 #4

State Court Pleadings Part 4

4 #3

State Court Pleadings Part 3

4 #2

State Court Pleadings Part 2

4 #1

State Court Pleadings Part 1

4 #4

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn for Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 03/25/2022. (am) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Elizabeth R. Penn by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:dft).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 3/25/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #4 Complaint to Huntington Ingalls Cross Claims by Bayer CropScience.Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience (pty:dft).(Stein, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #4 Complaint to Huntington Ingalls Cross Claims by Union Carbide Corporation.(Stein, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint to Albert Albert Bossier's Cross Claims by Union Carbide Corporation.Attorney David M. Stein added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(Stein, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross Claim by Eagle, Inc.(McQuillar, April) Modified text on 3/17/2022 (am). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll April Ann McQuillar as Counsel of Record for for Eagle, Inc. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/15/2022. (clc) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record April A. McQuillar by Eagle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Douglas Kinler added to party Eagle, Inc.(pty:dft).(Kinler, Douglas) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance with Court's Directive by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Part 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Part 2, #3 State Court Pleadings Part 3, #4 State Court Pleadings Part 4, #5 State Court Pleadings Part 5, #6 State Court Pleadings Part 6, #7 State Court Pleadings Part 7)(Boyd, Erin) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(lw) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-05775, F-14 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9201943) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Erin Helen Boyd added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(pty:def).(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 2/1/2022 (lw). (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MOTORISTSINSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Anco Insulation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARLOCK INC is a litigant