This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 09:31:45 (UTC).

Taylor et al v. Velox Express, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Velox Express, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00927

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Taylor

James Taylor

Defendant

Velox Express, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan L. Griffith

Attorney at Griffith Law

256 Seaboard Lane, Suite E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

Christopher Neil Coyne

Attorney at Griffith Law

256 Seaboard Lane, Suite E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

Craig Powers Glenn

Attorney at Griffith Law

256 Seaboard Lane, Suite E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph F. Welborn, III

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Nashville)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Nashville)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Copy of Notice of Filing of Removal for Circuit Court

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Copy of Circuit Court File

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint by Velox Express, Inc..(Hadley, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Craig Powers Glenn admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Powers Glenn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #11 is GRANTED until 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/05/2020. (ln) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Velox Express, Inc.. (Hadley, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has not included a statement that it has conferred with Plaintiffs regarding this motion and whether the relief requested is opposed, as is required by this Court's Local Rule 7.01(a) (1). The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling with the required statement included. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/5/2020. (am) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, [1-2] Complaint by Velox Express, Inc.. (Hadley, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan L. Griffith, Christopher N. Coyne, Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley, and Joseph F. Welborn, III admitted to this court. (ln) Modified on 10/29/2020 (ln). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ortiz Hadley on behalf of Velox Express, Inc. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Welborn, III on behalf of Velox Express, Inc. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Velox Express, Inc. (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Velox Express, Inc. from Circuit Court of Davidson County, case number 20C1956. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3245310) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Circuit Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Notice of Filing of Removal for Circuit Court)(ln) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/29/2020) (ln). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/29/2020) (ln). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/29/2020) (ln). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/29/2020) (ln). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Powers Glenn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher N. Coyle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan L. Griffith