This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 07:50:17 (UTC).

TAYLOR et al v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 TAYLOR filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03676

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RHONDA TAYLOR

TONYA ANDERSON

Defendant

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND doing business as UPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL BREEN

Attorney at THE ROTHENBERG LAW FIRM LLP

1420 Walnut Street, Second Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

GARRETT D. KENNEDY

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC... (KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#3

(#3) EXHIBIT - DESIGNATION FORM - by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC... (KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), - Stipulation Extending Time To Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint - by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BE AND IS HEREBY EXTENDED BY SIXTY (60) DAYS, THROUGH AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 28, 2022. THE COURT WILL NOT GRANT ANY FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF THIS DEADLINE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/20/2022. 9/20/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BE AND IS HEREBY EXTENDED BY SIXTY (60) DAYS, THROUGH AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 28, 2022. THE COURT WILL NOT GRANT ANY FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF THIS DEADLINE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 9/20/2022. 9/20/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), - Stipulation Extending Time To Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint - by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (jaa, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT - DESIGNATION FORM - by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC... (KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC... (KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16173640), filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KENNEDY, GARRETT) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garrett David Kennedy