This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2021 at 10:10:00 (UTC).

Taylor et al v. Alcon Vision, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Taylor filed an Other lawsuit against Alcon Vision, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04019

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexys Taylor

America Hailselassie

Defendant

Alcon Vision, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Michael Wise

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr, Kane, & Conway, LLP

818 Lafayette Ave., Floor 2

St. Louis, MO 63104

Adam John Florek

Attorney at Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane & Conway, APLC

818 Lafayette Ave., Floor 2

St. Louis, MO 63104

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Edward Ostfeld

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Tiffany S. Fordyce

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Brian Charles Miller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, Llp

77 @. Wacker Dr., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Exhibit

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alexys Taylor by Adam John Florek (Florek, Adam) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule on the Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC's motion to dismiss #12 , the briefing schedule is as follows: Plaintiff's response is due 10/1/2021; Defendants reply is due 10/22/2021; the motion is taken under advisement and the Court will issue a ruling by mail. Deadline to file a joint status report and the initial status hearing set for 9/16/2021 are stricken. Notice of motion date of 9/2/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice #11 acts as a stipulation of dismissal under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Plaintiff AmericaHaileselassie. The case remains pending as to Plaintiff Alexis Taylor with allexisting deadlines in place. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion #11 as moot. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/26/2021: Mailed notice (gw, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Gregory Edward Ostfeld for presentment of motion to dismiss #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/2/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Ostfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM by Alcon Vision, LLC in support of motion to dismiss #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ostfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC to dismiss (Ostfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Plaintiff America Hailselassie to dismiss Plaintiff America Haileselassie (Wise, Brandon) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted to and including 8/25/2021. Notice of motion date of 8/5/2021 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Joint status report remains due on 9/10/2021. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/3/2021. Mailed notice (jn, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Brian Charles Miller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/5/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Miller, Brian) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs America Hailselassie, Alexys Taylor by Brandon Michael Wise (Wise, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 (Unopposed) (Miller, Brian) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (jn, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 9/10/2021. Initial telephone conference is set for 9/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC by Brian Charles Miller (Miller, Brian) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC by Tiffany S. Fordyce (Fordyce, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alcon Vision, LLC by Gregory Edward Ostfeld (Ostfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021CH02967) filed by Alcon Vision, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18508864. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ostfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon Vision, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiffany S. Fordyce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian C Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory E Ostfeld