Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 09:15:43 (UTC).

Taylor #499227 v. Jackson et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Taylor 499227 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00991

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lance Taylor #499227

Muskegon Heights, MI 49444

Defendants

Shane Jackson

T. Pipkins

P. Davis

F. Johnson

B. Smith

K. Brege

D. Melton

T. Page

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER denying #2 , #3 , #4 , #9 , #10 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#11

(#11) OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for declaratory judgment by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

9 #1

Attachment 1 - Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for preliminary injunction (titled as 'Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction') by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Order) (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

7 #1

Exhibits

#7

(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against K. Brege, P. Davis, Shane Jackson, F. Johnson, D. Melton, T. Pipkins filed by Lance Taylor #499227 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

6 #2

Attachment 1

6 #1

Financial Documents

#6

(#6) PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Account Activity and MDOC Trust Account Statement for the period 6/4/19 to 12/4/19 submitted by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents, #2 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 12/20/2019 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 12/20/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

4 #1

Attachment 1

#4

(#4) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for declaratory judgment by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against K. Brege, P. Davis, Shane Jackson, F. Johnson, D. Melton, T. Page, T. Pipkins, B. Smith filed by Lance Taylor #499227 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #13 , Opinion (Screening) #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Taylor #499227 (ems) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER denying #2 , #3 , #4 , #9 , #10 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Taylor #499227 (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for declaratory judgment by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for preliminary injunction (titled as 'Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction') by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Order) (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against K. Brege, P. Davis, Shane Jackson, F. Johnson, D. Melton, T. Pipkins filed by Lance Taylor #499227 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (as taken from #6 ) by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Account Activity and MDOC Trust Account Statement for the period 6/4/19 to 12/4/19 submitted by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents, #2 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Deficiency Order, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Taylor #499227 (ems) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 12/20/2019 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 12/20/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for declaratory judgment by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Lance Taylor #499227; (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against K. Brege, P. Davis, Shane Jackson, F. Johnson, D. Melton, T. Page, T. Pipkins, B. Smith filed by Lance Taylor #499227 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ems) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less