This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 07:22:31 (UTC).

Tawfik abdo Saleh Ahmed et al v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 Tawfik abdo Saleh Ahmed filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Alejandro Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07031

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed

Fatima Kassim Ali

Kassim Faisal Muthana

S.F.M.

Defendants

Alejandro Mayorkas

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ur Jaddou

California Service Center

Director Kathy A. Baran

U.S. Department of State

Djibouti U.S. Embassy

Antony Blinken

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Julie Ann Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg and Associates

14370 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants California Service Center, Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Ur Jaddou, Kathy A. Baran, U.S. Department of State, Djibouti U.S. Embassy, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Kathy A. Baran(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Antony Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party California Service Center(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Djibouti U.S. Embassy(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party U.S. Department of State(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kassim Faisal Muthana, Fatima Kassim Ali, Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed, S.F.M., upon Defendant Kathy A. Baran served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; Antony Blinken served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; California Service Center served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; Djibouti U.S. Embassy served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; Ur Jaddou served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; U.S. Department of State served on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to K. Lusby, Robert Martin. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-07031 PA(ASx). (rn) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Kathy A. Baran, Antony Blinken, California Service Center, Djibouti U.S. Embassy, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (sh) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed, Fatima Kassim Ali, Kassim Faisal Muthana, S.F.M., (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed, Fatima Kassim Ali, Kassim Faisal Muthana, S.F.M.. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed, Fatima Kassim Ali, Kassim Faisal Muthana, S.F.M.. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34065972 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Kassim Faisal Muthana, Fatima Kassim Ali, Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed, S.F.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - FF) (Attorney Julie Ann Goldberg added to party Tawfik Abdo Saleh Ahmed(pty:pla), Attorney Julie Ann Goldberg added to party Fatima Kassim Ali(pty:pla), Attorney Julie Ann Goldberg added to party Kassim Faisal Muthana(pty:pla), Attorney Julie Ann Goldberg added to party S.F.M.(pty:pla))(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less