This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 09:39:07 (UTC).

Tavarez-Vargas v. Razer USA LTD.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Tavarez-Vargas filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Razer USA LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10381

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Tavarez-Vargas

Defendant

Razer USA LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Kao

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Razer USA LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25427004)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Razer USA LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Razer USA LTD.. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher Kao dated January 6, 2022. Document filed by Razer USA LTD...(Kao, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/6/22) (yv) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have settled this action, it is, on this 31st day of January, 2022, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Unless the Court ordersotherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/31/2022) (ama) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have settled this action, it is, on this 31st day of January, 2022, hereby ordered that this matter be discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this order, counsel for the plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty (30) days of this order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Unless the Court ordersotherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. All pending motions are dismissed as moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/31/2022) (ama) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Razer USA LTD. answer due 1/28/2022. (yv) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/6/22) (yv) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher Kao dated January 6, 2022. Document filed by Razer USA LTD...(Kao, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Razer USA LTD.. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Razer USA LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Razer USA LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25427004)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Razer USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Kao