This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:51:57 (UTC).

Tavarez-Vargas v. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Tavarez-Vargas filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09821

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Tavarez-Vargas

Defendant

Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jarrett Scott Charo

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

William Downes

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorneys

Colby Berman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

Peter T. Shapiro

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Water St)

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25377109)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/9/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. Service was accepted by Helen Thomas, Agent. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Charo, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Downes, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter T. Shapiro dated January 19, 2022. Document filed by Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colby Berman on behalf of Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(Berman, Colby) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter T. Shapiro dated January 19, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 10. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. answer due 1/28/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/19/2022) (rro) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter T. Shapiro dated January 19, 2022., #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 10. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. answer due 1/28/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/19/2022) (rro) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colby Berman on behalf of Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(Berman, Colby) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter T. Shapiro dated January 19, 2022. Document filed by Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Downes, William) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Charo, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. Service was accepted by Helen Thomas, Agent. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/9/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Y. Kroub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25377109)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pre-Paid Legal Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter T. Shapiro Esq.