This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 08:53:34 (UTC).

Tavarez v. Nurture, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Tavarez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Nurture, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09830

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victoriano Tavarez

Defendant

Nurture, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Downes

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nurture, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25377319)Document filed by Victoriano Tavarez..(Downes, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Downes, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nurture, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victoriano Tavarez..(Downes, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nurture, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/26/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is scheduled for March 15, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. by separate order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/9/2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/26/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is scheduled for March 15, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. by separate order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/9/2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/26/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/26/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nurture, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Downes. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nurture, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Victoriano Tavarez..(Downes, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Downes, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nurture, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25377319)Document filed by Victoriano Tavarez..(Downes, William) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nurture, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Downes