This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2019 at 07:25:37 (UTC).

Tavano v. Weaver

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Tavano filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Weaver. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01635

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suzanne Tavano

Defendant

Larel Weaver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce D. Tingey

Attorney at Tingey & Tingey

2001 W. Charleston Blvd.

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Caleb Meyer

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

8945 W. Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Cassidy Roy Ellis

Attorney at Messner Reeves

8945 W. Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Renee M Finch

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

8945 W. Russell Road, Ste. 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Cassidy Ellis

Attorney at Messner Reeves

8945 W Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Motions due by 4/4/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#9

(#9) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Larel Weaver. (Ellis, Cassidy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Suzanne Tavano. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tingey, Bruce) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Larel Weaver. (Ellis, Cassidy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Larel Weaver. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ellis, Cassidy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/2/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Motions due by 4/4/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Larel Weaver. (Ellis, Cassidy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Suzanne Tavano. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tingey, Bruce) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Larel Weaver. (Ellis, Cassidy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Larel Weaver. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ellis, Cassidy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . Documents not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/2/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-799343-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5705225) by Larel Weaver. (Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 9/17/2019 to restrict access pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 (MMM). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce D. Tingey