This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2019 at 07:01:26 (UTC).

Tatum v. Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center

Case Summary

On 09/28/2019 a Labor - Labor Standard case was filed by Tatum against Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02262

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kara M. Tatum

Defendant

Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie Clutter Cortes

Attorney at Legal Aid Society of Cleveland - Downtown

1223 West Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

6 #5

USM-285 Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel

1 #3

USM-285 US Marshal Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #18

Exhibit L

1 #4

Exhibit A

6 #4

Summons US Attorney NDOH

6 #1

USM-285 US Attorney

6 #2

Summons US Attorney

6 #3

USM-285 US Attorney NDOH

1 #17

Exhibit K

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Department of Veteran Affairs.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kara M Tatum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285 US Marshal Form, #4 Exhibit A-mail receipt, #5 Exhibit B-email, #6 Exhibit C-email, #7 Exhibit D-email, #8 Exhibit E-letter, #9 Exhibit F-email, #10 Exhibit G-pay record, #11 Exhibit H-1-pay record, #12 Exhibit H-2-pay record, #13 Exhibit H-3-pay record, #14 Exhibit I-1-pay record, #15 Exhibit I-2-bank reocrd, #16 Exhibit J-pay record, #17 Exhibit K-pay record, #18 Exhibit L-bank record, #19 Exhibit M-email, #20 Exhibit N-email, #21 Exhibit O-pay record) (Cortes, Julie) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (S,SR). (Entered: 09/28/2019)

1 #16

Exhibit J

1 #15

Exhibit I-2

1 #2

Summons

1 #20

Exhibit N

1 #19

Exhibit M

#7

(#7) Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#6

(#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Kara M. Tatum. Related document(s) #1 ,. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 USM-285 US Attorney NDOH, #4 Summons US Attorney NDOH, #5 USM-285 Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel, #6 Summons Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel)(Cortes, Julie) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Kara M. Tatum. Related document(s) #1 ,. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 USM-285 US Attorney NDOH, #4 Summons US Attorney NDOH, #5 USM-285 Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel, #6 Summons Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel)(Cortes, Julie) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Original Summons reissued and USM-285 US Marshal Form to U. S. Marshal for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons issued to Counsel for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/30/2019.(L,Ja) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (S,SR) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kara M Tatum. Related document(s) #1 . (Cortes, Julie) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against Department of Veteran Affairs.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kara M Tatum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285 US Marshal Form, #4 Exhibit A-mail receipt, #5 Exhibit B-email, #6 Exhibit C-email, #7 Exhibit D-email, #8 Exhibit E-letter, #9 Exhibit F-email, #10 Exhibit G-pay record, #11 Exhibit H-1-pay record, #12 Exhibit H-2-pay record, #13 Exhibit H-3-pay record, #14 Exhibit I-1-pay record, #15 Exhibit I-2-bank reocrd, #16 Exhibit J-pay record, #17 Exhibit K-pay record, #18 Exhibit L-bank record, #19 Exhibit M-email, #20 Exhibit N-email, #21 Exhibit O-pay record) (Cortes, Julie) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (S,SR). (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.