This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2021 at 08:32:13 (UTC).

TATLER v. ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 TATLER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-10658

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENISE TATLER

Defendants

ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. ESTEE LAUDER A/K/A AND/OR D/B/A ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. also known as ESTEE LAUDER

ESTEE LAUDER

XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-5

JOHN DOES #1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC A. WEINBERG

Attorney at SAFFERN & WEINBERG

815 Greenwood Ave., Suite 22

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH C. DEBLASIO

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

766 Shrewsbury Ave

Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

KATHERINE M. DICICCO

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

766 Shrewsbury Ave, Suite 101

Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

NOORIN HAMID

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

766 Shrewsbury Avenue, Suite 101

Tinton Falls, NJ 07724

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NOORIN HAMID on behalf of ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. (HAMID, NOORIN) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/26/2021. (jem) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC..(DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. identifying ELC BEAUTY, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant.. (DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

1 #2

Notice of Compliance

1 #1

Certificate of Service

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, LAW DIV, MONMOUTH COUNTY, case number MON-L-1143-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12433738), filed by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Compliance)(DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by NOORIN HAMID on behalf of ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. (HAMID, NOORIN) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/26/2021. (jem) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC..(DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/25/2021. (jem) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. identifying ELC BEAUTY, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant.. (DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, LAW DIV, MONMOUTH COUNTY, case number MON-L-1143-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12433738), filed by ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Compliance)(DEBLASIO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARC A. WEINBERG