This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:41:13 (UTC).

Tate v. Tomahsen et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Tate filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Tomahsen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce Howe Hendricks and Shiva V Hodges. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03393

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

Referral Judge

Shiva V Hodges

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travonte Tate

Ridgeville, SC 29472

Defendants

Officer Tomahsen

Officer Williamson

Dr. Bryan

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/23/2019. (bgoo) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

9 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/5/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#14

(#14) Summons Issued as to Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson. Service due by 3/23/2020 (bgoo) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Travonte Tate. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#16

RESTRICTED

#23

(#23) Summons Issued as to Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson. Service due by 3/23/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#21

(#21) ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/28/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson, filed by Travonte Tate. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Summons Issued as to Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson. Service due by 3/23/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 Order 1983 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Travonte Tate, 337639, M.C.I., 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (lbak) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/28/2020. (lbak) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#18) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Order and three Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Travonte Tate, 337639, M.C.I., 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (lbak) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is advised that, pursuant to ECF No. 16, the United States Marshal Service was unable to serve Defendants due to insufficient information to identify them. As noted in the undersigned's December 23, 2019 order, Plaintiff is responsible for information sufficient to identify each defendant on the Form USM-285. Further, unserved defendants may be dismissed as parties to this case if not served by March 23, 2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to send new Forms USM-285 to Plaintiff so that he may provide more identifying information for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/14/20. (vhor) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Returned Unexecuted (Restricted Access) by Travonte Tate as to Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson. (lbak) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson. Service due by 3/23/2020 (bgoo) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order 1983 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Travonte Tate, 337639, M.C.I., 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899 (bgoo) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/23/2019. (bgoo) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Travonte Tate. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, one Summons, three Forms USM-285 and a copy of the complaint placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Travonte Tate, 337639, Lieber Corr. Institution, PO Box 205, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 12/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/5/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#3) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (lbak) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Travonte Tate. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bryan, Tomahsen, Williamson, filed by Travonte Tate. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.