This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:03 (UTC).

Tate v. Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Tate filed an Other lawsuit against Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03352

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dashawna Tate

Defendant

Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James X. Bormes

Attorney at Law Office of James X. Bormes

8 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60603

Catherine P. Sons

Attorney at Law Office of James X. Bormes, P.C.

8 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Phillip Russell Perdew

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

William Patrick Conlon

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

111 S. Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

Brent A Turman

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

Suite 1900, 2323 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Alana K Ackels

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

Suite 1900, 2323 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Julia Sarah Wolf

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

150 North Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Jason A. Selvey

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Jody Kahn Mason

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Chicago)

150 N. Michigan Ave, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (19 CH 02682) filed by Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC by William Patrick Conlon (Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC by Phillip Russell Perdew (Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC (Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#23

(#23) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 6/25/2019 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (las, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION by Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC to remand Joint Agreed Motion to Remand Case (Mason, Jody) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Joint Agreed Motion to Remand Case #20 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remand case to Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois forthwith. Motion and Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of motion to remand #20 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mason, Jody) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#17

(#17) MOTION by Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC to substitute attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

17 #1

Exhibit A

17 #2

Exhibit B

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for substitution of counsel #17 is granted. Attorneys Jody Kahn Mason,Jason A. Selvey and Julia Sarah Wolf are added for Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI. Motion hearing set for 6/20/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

17 #3

Exhibit C

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (lk, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REMAND with certified copy of order dated 6/25/2019 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (las, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Joint Agreed Motion to Remand Case #20 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remand case to Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois forthwith. Motion and Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Motion by Jody Kahn Mason for presentment of motion to remand #20 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Mason, Jody) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION by Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC to remand Joint Agreed Motion to Remand Case (Mason, Jody) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for substitution of counsel #17 is granted. Attorneys Jody Kahn Mason,Jason A. Selvey and Julia Sarah Wolf are added for Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI. Motion hearing set for 6/20/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Motion by Phillip Russell Perdew for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #17 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION by Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC to substitute attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC(Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15856931. (Ackels, Alana) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC (Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC by Phillip Russell Perdew (Perdew, Phillip) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC by William Patrick Conlon (Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (19 CH 02682) filed by Movie Grill Concepts XXVI, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Conlon, William) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less