This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 08:44:49 (UTC).

TATE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 TATE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04463

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARMINE TATE

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

MCNEIL-PPC, INC.

WALMART STORES, INC.

WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-10

MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN WILLIAM FAY

Attorney at Golomb Spirt Grunfeld PC

1835 Market Street, Suite 2900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC. and WALMART STORES, INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/9/22. (mbh) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Designation Form

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC. and WALMART STORES, INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/9/22. (mbh) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#5

(#5) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 8). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of October 5, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to theHonorable Denise L. Cote. (mbh) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketTransferred to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York via CM/ECF System pursuant to CTO-8. (mbh) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 8). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of October 5, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to theHonorable Denise L. Cote. (mbh) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC. and WALMART STORES, INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/9/22. (mbh) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT CHARMAINE TATE against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHARMINE TATE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FAY, KEVIN) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, MCNEIL-PPC, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC. and WALMART STORES, INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/9/22. (mbh) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT CHARMAINE TATE against MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16300754.), filed by CHARMINE TATE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FAY, KEVIN) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McNeil Consumer Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant