This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2021 at 07:11:33 (UTC).

Taste of Belgium LLC v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 Taste of Belgium LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael R. Barrett and Matthew W. McFarland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00357

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael R. Barrett

Matthew W. McFarland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taste of Belgium LLC

Defendants

The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, and Cincinnati Financial Corporation

Cincinnati Financial Corporation

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

The Cincinnati Indemnity Company

The Cincinnati Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian A Jenkins

Attorney at Minnillo & Jenkins Co., LPA

2712 Observatory Avenue

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider, LPA

4445 Lake Forest Drive, Suite 490

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Todd B Naylor

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider, LPA

4445 Lake Forest Drive, Suite 490

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Alison Anne DeVilliers

Attorney at Beckman Weil Shepardson LLC

300 Pike Street, Suite 400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Kristen Marie Myers

Attorney at Beckman Weil Shepardson LLC

895 Central Avenue, Suite 300

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorneys

Michael K Farrell

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Ste. 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Laurence J. Tooth

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Rodger L Eckelberry

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - 2

200 Civic Center Drive, Suite 1200

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#22

21 #3

Exhibit Ex 3 - Vandalay Case

21 #2

Exhibit Ex 2 - It's Nice Case

21 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - ISO Circular

16 #4

Exhibit Ex 4 - Social Life v. Sentinel Transcript

16 #3

Exhibit Ex 3 - Gavrilides Order and Transcript

16 #2

Exhibit Ex 2 - Rose 1 Order

16 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - CDC Guidelines

#16

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C - Directors Order

1 #3

Exhibit B - Ohio Government Order

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil case terminated per Doc. #22 . (kaf) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Taste of Belgium LLC (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - ISO Circular, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - It's Nice Case, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Vandalay Case) (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER DENYING TRANSFER of these Southern District of Ohio cases to the MDL No.2962. Signed by the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 10/5/2020. (er) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER: Upon consideration, the Court GRANTS Defendants' #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall file their reply no later than October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/23/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 10/9/2020. by Defendants Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael) Modified to create link to motion on 9/23/2020 (eh). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Taste of Belgium LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: K.C. Hopps LTD Order) (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER: Upon consideration, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants' motion no later than September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 08/31/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM New date requested 9/10/2020. by Plaintiff Taste of Belgium LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - CDC Guidelines, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Rose 1 Order, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Gavrilides Order and Transcript, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Social Life v. Sentinel Transcript) (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Certify Questions to the Ohio Supreme Court by Defendants Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - CDC Guidance, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - SDNY Social Life Magazine, Inc. v. Sentinel Ins. Co Ltd. Hearing Transcript) (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7517341) of Laurence Tooth by Defendants Cincinnati Financial Corporation, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Cincinnati Casualty Company on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; The Cincinnati Indemnity Company on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; The Cincinnati Insurance Company on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Taste of Belgium LLC. (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Cincinnati Financial Corporation on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg for Plaintiff Taste of Belgium LLC (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/5/20. (ba) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, and Cincinnati Financial Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7452222), filed by Taste of Belgium LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Copy of Taste of Belgium policy, #3 Exhibit B - Ohio Government Order, #4 Exhibit C - Directors Order) (Jenkins, Christian) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cincinnati Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant