This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2020 at 09:34:14 (UTC).

Mardig Taslakian v. Target Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Mardig Taslakian filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02667

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mardig Taslakian

Defendants

TARGET BRANDS, INC., a Minnesota corporation

TARGET CORPORATION, a Minnesota corporation

Target Corporation

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Target Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sareen Bezdikian

Attorney at Bezdik Kassab Law Group

790 East Colorado Boulevard 9Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101

Raffi Kassabian

Attorney at Bezdik Kassab Law Group

790 East Colorado Boulevard 9Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Mardig Taslakian. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bezdikian, Sareen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Target Brands, Inc., Target Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mardig Taslakian, (Bezdikian, Sareen) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mardig Taslakian. (Bezdikian, Sareen) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25810774 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mardig Taslakian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Sareen Bezdikian added to party Mardig Taslakian(pty:pla))(Bezdikian, Sareen) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less