This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 07:09:12 (UTC).

Tarsio v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Tarsio filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-09993

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Tarsio

Defendants

FCA US LLC

STELLANTIS N.V.

Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Seth Garber

Attorney at Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP

One North Broadway, Suite 900

White Plains, NY 10601

John Dominic Sardesai-Grant

Attorney at Finkelstein Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP

445 Hamilton Ave, Suite 605

White Plains, NY 10601

Defendant Attorney

James Simon Coons

Attorney at Ansa Assuncao, LLP

707 Westchester Avenue, Suite 309

White Plains, NY 10604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, STELLANTIS N.V.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27001482)Document filed by Anthony Tarsio..(Garber, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garber, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FCA US LLC; Stellantis N.V., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Tarsio..(Garber, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FCA US LLC, Stellantis N.V...(pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Simon Coons on behalf of FCA US LLC..(Coons, James) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#6

(#6) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from James S. Coons dated 12/16/2022 re: request for extension. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's consented-to request is GRANTED. Defendant is directed to respond or otherwise seek leave to move in response to the Complaint by Jan. 23, 2023., FCA US LLC answer due 1/23/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/19/2022) (ate) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Dominic Sardesai-Grant on behalf of Anthony Tarsio..(Sardesai-Grant, John) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Dominic Sardesai-Grant on behalf of Anthony Tarsio..(Sardesai-Grant, John) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from James S. Coons dated 12/16/2022 re: request for extension. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's consented-to request is GRANTED. Defendant is directed to respond or otherwise seek leave to move in response to the Complaint by Jan. 23, 2023., FCA US LLC answer due 1/23/2023. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/19/2022) (ate) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Simon Coons on behalf of FCA US LLC..(Coons, James) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FCA US LLC, Stellantis N.V...(pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Todd Seth Garber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: STELLANTIS N.V., Anthony Tarsio. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Todd Seth Garber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to Orange;. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FCA US LLC; Stellantis N.V., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Tarsio..(Garber, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garber, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, STELLANTIS N.V.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27001482)Document filed by Anthony Tarsio..(Garber, Todd) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Simon Coons