This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2020 at 07:54:33 (UTC).

Tarpinian v. SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Tarpinian filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03522

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael C Tarpinian

Defendant

SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Eugene Givens

Attorney at Gregory E. Givens, P.C., Law Offices of

18 North Sierra Madre Street, Suite E

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Defendant Attorney

Carrie Marie Francis

Attorney at Stinson LLP-Phoenix

1850 North Central Avenue, Suite 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. That there being no parties or claims remaining, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/14/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order to Dismiss)(Francis, Carrie) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC All parties do not consent.. (Francis, Carrie) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC.. (Francis, Carrie) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Eugene Givens on behalf of Michael C Tarpinian (Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service-SCI Colorado Funeral Services, LLC

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael C Tarpinian. SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service-SCI Colorado Funeral Services, LLC)(Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/10/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/3/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/17/2019. (ksena) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to SCI COLORADO FUNERAL SERVICES, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Michael C Tarpinian. (Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action against SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7043698)Attorney Gregory Eugene Givens added to party Michael C Tarpinian(pty:pla), filed by Michael C Tarpinian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff)(Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. That there being no parties or claims remaining, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/14/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order to Dismiss)(Francis, Carrie) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03522-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC All parties do not consent.. (Francis, Carrie) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC.. (Francis, Carrie) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Eugene Givens on behalf of Michael C Tarpinian (Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • Docket(#7) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Gregory Eugene Givens was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (kmont) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael C Tarpinian. SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service-SCI Colorado Funeral Services, LLC)(Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/10/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/3/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/17/2019. (ksena) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to SCI COLORADO FUNERAL SERVICES, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Michael C Tarpinian. (Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action against SCI Colorado Funeral Services LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7043698)Attorney Gregory Eugene Givens added to party Michael C Tarpinian(pty:pla), filed by Michael C Tarpinian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff)(Givens, Gregory) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Marie Francis