This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 12:40:26 (UTC).

Target Brands, Inc. v. VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Target Brands, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller and Wilma A. Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virgin Islands District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Target Brands, Inc.

Defendant

VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad C. Messier

Attorney at Dudley Topper & Feuerzeig

1000 Frederiksberg Gade, P.O. Box 756

St Thomas, VI 00804

James Robert Steffen

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South 7Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

Kevin A Rames

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin A. Rames, P.C..

2111 Company Street, Suite 3

St Croix, VI 00820

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) Voluntary Disclosures (Amended) by VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target re #15 Notice (Other) (Rames, Kevin) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Voluntary Disclosures by VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target (Rames, Kevin) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Service of Target Brands, Inc.'s Rule 26 Disclosures by Target Brands, Inc. (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) STIPULATION - Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Agreed Protective Order by Target Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant VI Target Liquidation Center, LLC by Target Brands, Inc. (Steffen, James) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Steffen on behalf of Plaintiff Target Brands, Inc. (Steffen, James) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target. (Rames, Kevin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/24/2019) (KAB). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Rames on behalf of Defendant VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target (Rames, Kevin) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

2 #4

Text of Proposed Order

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Declaration of James R. Steffen

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-787202.)filed by Target Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) Voluntary Disclosures (Amended) by VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target re #15 Notice (Other) (Rames, Kevin) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Voluntary Disclosures by VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target (Rames, Kevin) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Service of Target Brands, Inc.'s Rule 26 Disclosures by Target Brands, Inc. (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION - Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Agreed Protective Order by Target Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant VI Target Liquidation Center, LLC by Target Brands, Inc. (Steffen, James) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Steffen on behalf of Plaintiff Target Brands, Inc. (Steffen, James) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target. (Rames, Kevin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/24/2019) (KAB). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A Rames on behalf of Defendant VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target (Rames, Kevin) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER (RM) granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James R. Steffen, Esquire, shall appear before this Court in person to take the oath when he is next in this jurisdiction. (AO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to VI TARGET LIQUIDATION CENTER, LLC d/b/a VI Target. (TRH) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TRH) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Brands, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation for Target Brands, Inc... (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: James R. Steffen(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number 0391-787836) by Plaintiff Target Brands, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of James R. Steffen, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-787202.)filed by Target Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Messier, Chad) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less