This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 07:37:11 (UTC).

Tarazon v. Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Tarazon filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02008

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apollonia Tarazon

Apollonia Taron

Defendant

Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinette G Kent

Attorney at Kent Law Offices

3219 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 588

Phoenix, AZ 85018

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20103938 filed by Apollonia Tarazon. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Apollonia Tarazon. (Kent, Trinette) (SCA) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20103938. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-02008-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on March 1, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (see attached Order for details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/1/21. (MAW) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#6

(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Apollonia Tarazon: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice upon Cavalry Portfolio Services, Inc. on 12/20/2021. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement as to Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC. by Apollonia Tarazon. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Apollonia Tarazon. Party Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC terminated. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the future, in other cases litigated before this Court, Counsel shall not include the designation that a voluntary dismissal, stipulation to dismiss, or notice of settlement pertains to a certain party when it in fact pertains to the sole (or sole remaining) defendant in the action, such that the entire action is subject to the dismissal or notice of settlement. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/24/22. (SST) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the future, in other cases litigated before this Court, Counsel shall not include the designation that a voluntary dismissal, stipulation to dismiss, or notice of settlement pertains to a certain party when it in fact pertains to the sole (or sole remaining) defendant in the action, such that the entire action is subject to the dismissal or notice of settlement. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/24/22. (SST) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Apollonia Tarazon. Party Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC terminated. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement as to Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC. by Apollonia Tarazon. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Apollonia Tarazon: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice upon Cavalry Portfolio Services, Inc. on 12/20/2021. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on March 1, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (see attached Order for details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/1/21. (MAW) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20103938. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-02008-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Apollonia Tarazon. (Kent, Trinette) (SCA) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20103938 filed by Apollonia Tarazon. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trinette G Kent