This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 09:02:09 (UTC).

Tao Group Holdings, LLC v. Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Tao Group Holdings, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tao Group Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert D. Mitchell

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

2525 E. Camelback Rd, 7Th Floor

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Krista Nielson

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

10100 W. Charleston Blvd., Ste 220

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Ace Clinton Van Patten

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco

10100 W. Charleston Blvd., Ste. 220

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Christopher T Pasich

Attorney at Pasich LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Peter A. Halprin

Attorney at Pasich LLP

757 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Caitlin S. Oswald

Attorney at Pasich LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Kirk Alan Pasich

Attorney at Pasich LLP

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa M D'Alelio

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Boylston Street, Suite 2500

Bosotn, MA 02199

Lee H. Gorlin

Attorney at FORAN GLENNON PALANDECH PONZI & RUDLOFF

2200 Paseo Verde Parkway, Suite 280

Henderson, NV 89052

Amy M. Samberg

Attorney at FORAN GLENNON PALANDECH PONZI & RUDLOFF

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street, Ste. 550

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#20

19 #2

Massachusetts - Certificate of Good Standing

19 #1

1st Circuit Certificate of Good Standing

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing

#15

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

#4

#2

1 #3

Summons Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1-3

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER. ORDER granting #19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melissa M. D'Alelio for Employers Insurance Company of Wausau and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Lee H. Gorlin. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/12/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melissa M. D'Alelio and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lee H. Gorlin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6441482) by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. (Attachments: #1 1st Circuit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Massachusetts - Certificate of Good Standing) (Gorlin, Lee) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Waiver Service and Set Response Date. Employers Insurance Company of Wausau answer due 5/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION and Order to Waiver Service and Set Response Date re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. (Samberg, Amy) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Mitchell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/25/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Mitchell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6415540) by Plaintiff Tao Group Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kirk Pasich and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher T. Pasich and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Caitlin S. Oswald and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kirk Pasich and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6411926) by Plaintiff Tao Group Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Caitlin S. Oswald and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6411906) by Plaintiff Tao Group Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Peter A. Halprin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/12/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Peter A. Halprin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Krista J. Nielson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6404070) by Plaintiff Tao Group Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tao Group Holdings, LLC re #1 Complaint,,. Employers Insurance Company of Wausau served on 3/9/2021. (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Caitlin S Oswald, Christopher T Pasich, Peter Halprin, Robert D Mitchell, to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2021. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Employers Insurance Company of Wausau re #1 Complaint. (DRS) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tao Group Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MSG TG LLC, Other Affiliate Madison Square Garden Entertainment Corp. for Tao Group Holdings, LLC added. (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Employers Insurance Company of Wausau (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6395408) by Tao Group Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Employers Insurance Company of Wausau) (Nielson, Krista) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAO GROUP HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Employers Insurance Company of Wausau is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter A Halprin(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Thomas Pasich