This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 09:33:59 (UTC).

Tanner v. Walmart

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Tanner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Tanner

Defendant

Walmart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Parker A. Allred

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

737 E Winchester St

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Alan D. Tucker

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

737 E Winchester St

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Colby B. Vogt

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

737 E Winchester St

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea M. Keysar

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Marianne Schumann

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Mitchel T. Rice

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit A

2 #3

Exhibit B

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/28/2021. Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Motions due by 1/10/2022. Deadline for filing a request for a scheduling conference with the District Judge for the purpose of setting a trial date if no dispositive motions are filed is due by 1/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/12/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/10/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walmart.(Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/4/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Michelle Tanner, Defendant Walmart. (dw) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District Court Weber County, case number 200904224, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3668040) filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Defendant Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan D. Tucker