This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2021 at 08:48:47 (UTC).

Tank v. Plug Power Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Tank filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Plug Power Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03985

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laxman Tank

Petitioners

Manfred Schumacher

Lin Ma

Thomas Chweh

Dennis Torres

Ashkan Shademan

Defendants

Paul B. Middleton

Andrew Marsh

Plug Power Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ralph M. Stone

Attorney at Stone Law Group PLLC

1700 Broadway, Ste 4100

New York, NY 10019

Petitioner Attorneys

Laurence Jesse Hasson

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard, LLP

10 East 40Th Street

New York, NY 10016

Andrea Farah

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Jeffrey Philip Campisi

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Regina Marie Calcaterra

Attorney at Calcaterra Pollack LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-5803

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel., #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-2004, 1:21-cv-3985 . MOTION to Appoint DENNIS TORRES to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Manfred Schumacher..(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Of Non-Opposition To Competing Motions re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-2004, 1:21-cv-3985 . MOTION to Appoint DENNIS TORRES to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Thomas Chweh, Lin Ma..(Farah, Andrea) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of of Non-Opposition of Dennis Torres to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Dennis Torres..(Campisi, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Manfred Schumacher..(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#13

No Description Available

#12

(#14) DECLARATION of Andrea Farah in Support re: #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Thomas Chweh, Lin Ma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certifications, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume).(Farah, Andrea) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#20) NOTICE of Of Non-Opposition To Competing Motions re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-2004, 1:21-cv-3985 . MOTION to Appoint DENNIS TORRES to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Thomas Chweh, Lin Ma..(Farah, Andrea) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#6

(#19) NOTICE of of Non-Opposition of Dennis Torres to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Dennis Torres..(Campisi, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc...(pc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/5/2021) (pc). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-02004-ER. Document filed by Laxman Tank..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Plug Power Inc., Andrew Marsh, and Paul B. Middleton, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Laxman Tank..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Manfred Schumacher..(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel., #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-2004, 1:21-cv-3985 . MOTION to Appoint DENNIS TORRES to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Manfred Schumacher..(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Of Non-Opposition To Competing Motions re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-2004, 1:21-cv-3985 . MOTION to Appoint DENNIS TORRES to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Thomas Chweh, Lin Ma..(Farah, Andrea) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of of Non-Opposition of Dennis Torres to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions re: #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint ASHKAN SHADEMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-02004-ER, 1:21-cv-03985-ER ., #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Dennis Torres..(Campisi, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #15 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Laurence J. Hasson in Support re: #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Manfred Schumacher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Early Notice, #2 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume).(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 . MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Manfred Schumacher..(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-03985, 1:21-cv-02004 ., MOTION to Appoint Manfred Schumacher to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Manfred Schumacher. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Hasson, Laurence) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Thomas Chweh, Lin Ma. Related Document Number: #12 ..(Farah, Andrea) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Andrea Farah in Support re: #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 21-cv-02004 and Motion of Lin Ma and Thomas Chweh For Appointment As Lead Plaintiffs and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Thomas Chweh, Lin Ma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certifications, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume).(Farah, Andrea) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-02004-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc...(pc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/5/2021) (pc). (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 21cv2004. (pc) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ralph M. Stone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Laxman Tank. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-02004-ER. Document filed by Laxman Tank..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Plug Power Inc., Andrew Marsh, and Paul B. Middleton, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Laxman Tank..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Marsh, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24493543)Document filed by Laxman Tank. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff).(Stone, Ralph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLUG POWER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea Farah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey P. Campisi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Regina Marie Calcaterra