This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 07:55:38 (UTC).

Tangri v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Tangri filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01646

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neetu Tangri

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip Sinclair Bather

Frank N. Darras

Susan Borondia Grabarsky

Defendant Attorneys

Linda Marie Lawson

Jason A. James

Patricia Ann Ellis

 

Court Documents

#16

#17

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

5 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#5

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint byThe Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Ellis, Patricia) (Filed on 5/1/2020) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #15 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. Long Term Disability Insurance Plan.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. Long Term Disability Insurance Plan filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Neetu Tangri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Jason) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America ("Prudential"), Other Affiliate Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Lawson, Linda) (Filed on 3/31/2020) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #5 Initial Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Neetu Tangri. (Ellis, Patricia) (Filed on 3/31/2020) Modified on 4/1/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neetu Tangri. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Tesla Motors, Inc. Long Term Disability Insurance Plan, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 03/09/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Neetu Tangri.. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT for Benefits Under an Employee Welfare Benefit Plan against All Defendants. Filed byNeetu Tangri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Neetu Tangri . (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Neetu Tangri. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY #5 FOR CORRECTED COMPLAINT*** COMPLAINT for Benefits Under an Employee Welfare Benefit Plan against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-14253419). Filed by Neetu Tangri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Grabarsky, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less