This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:19:31 (UTC).

In re Eastman Kodak Company Securities Litigation

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 In re Eastman Kodak Company Securities Litigation was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-06418

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tiandong Tang

Les Investissements Kiz Inc.

UAT Trading Service, Inc.

Margaretha Welkhammer

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

Broward Motorsports Holdings LLC

SRR Fortress Capital LLC

Daniel Yannes

Scott Reynolds

Les Investissements Kiz Inc.

John McMullan

Doug Atkin

Alfred Fenelle

UAT Trading Service, Inc.

Gary Eberhard

Kodak Investor Group

Alexander Enciso

Kevin Harte

Yiqi Woodling

Charles Satterwhite

Defendants

David Bullwinkle

James V. Continenza

Eastman Kodak Company

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel B. Strauss

Attorney at KAPLAN FOX & KILSHEIMER LLP

850 Third Ave., 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Frederic S. Fox

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10002

James E. Cecchi

Attorney at CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Audra Depaolo

Attorney at COHN LIFLAND PEARLMAN HERMANN & KNOPF LLP

250 Peble Ave, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

Peter S. Pearlman

Attorney at COHN, LIFLAND, PEARLMAN, HERRMANN & KNOPF, LLP

250 Pehle Avenue, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

Anthony Michael Christina

Attorney at LOWEY DANNENBERG, P.C.

One Tower Bridge

Serina Marie Vash

Attorney at HERMAN JONES LLP

153 Central Avenue #131

Westfield, NJ 07090

Lisa J. Rodriguez

Attorney at Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

220 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002-1165

Laurence M. Rosen

Attorney at THE ROSEN LAW FIRM, P.A.

One Gateway Center, Suite 2600

Newark, NJ 07102

Eduard Korsinsky

Attorney at LEVI & KORSINSKY LLP

55 Broadway, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Gustavo Fabian Bruckner

Attorney at POMERANTZ LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Janine L. Pollack

Attorney at CALCATERRA POLLACK LLP

1140 Avenue Of The Americas, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Bruce Daniel Greenberg

Attorney at LITE DEPALMA GREENBERG & AFANADOR, LLC

570 Broad Street, Suite 1201

Newark, NJ 07102

Eric Todd Kanefsky

Attorney at CALCAGNI & KANEFSKY LLP

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Blvd., 14Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Nathaniel A. Tarnor

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP

322 Eigth Avenue, Suite 802

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen M. Baldini

Attorney at AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER &

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Ali R. Rabbani

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - LA

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6022

Carolyn G. Nussbaum

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1300 Clinton Square, Suite 1244

Rochester, NY 14604

Richard A. McGuirk

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1300 Clinton Square

Rochester, NY 14604

Neal Ross Marder

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP - LA

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6022

65 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#194

(#194) Letter filed by Les Investissements Kiz Inc., UAT Trading Service, Inc. as to Eastman Kodak Company, Jeffrey Engelberg, Roger W. Byrd, Philippe D. Katz, James V. Continenza, Richard "Todd" Bradley, David Bullwinkle, Jason New, William G. Parrett Re: Demonstratives to be Used at the August 3, 2022 Hearing. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

192 #1

Supporting Documents

192 #192

Main Document

190 #5

Benjamin A. Naftalis' CM/ECF Registration Form

190 #4

Benjamin A. Naftalis' Civility Principles Oath

190 #3

Benjamin A. Naftalis' Attorney's Oath

190 #2

Benjamin A. Naftalis' Admission Sponsor Affidavit

190 #1

Benjamin A. Naftalis' Admission Petition Form

190 #190

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certification

#1

358 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) TEXT ORDER granting #192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joshua A. Rubin. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/01/2022. (MGB)Clerk to Follow up (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) Letter filed by Les Investissements Kiz Inc., UAT Trading Service, Inc. as to Eastman Kodak Company, Jeffrey Engelberg, Roger W. Byrd, Philippe D. Katz, James V. Continenza, Richard "Todd" Bradley, David Bullwinkle, Jason New, William G. Parrett Re: Demonstratives to be Used at the August 3, 2022 Hearing. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#193) TEXT ORDER granting #190 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin A. Naftalis. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 07/29/2022. (MGB)Clerk to Follow up (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Josh A. Rubin ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4638464.) by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Nussbaum, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company re #159 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BY ALL DEFENDANTS Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority in further support of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nussbaum, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: #189 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Incorrect event used to electronically file document. Modified the docket entry. (RE) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Benjamin A. Naftalis ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4637009.) by Richard "Todd" Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Benjamin A. Naftalis' Admission Petition Form, #2 Benjamin A. Naftalis' Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Benjamin A. Naftalis' Attorney's Oath, #4 Benjamin A. Naftalis' Civility Principles Oath, #5 Benjamin A. Naftalis' CM/ECF Registration Form)(Hammel, Jeff) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#189) Notice to Withdraw as Attorney by Roger W. Byrd.(Card, Joshua) Modified event and docket text on 7/28/2022 (RE). (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#188) REPLY/RESPONSE to re #187 Notice (Other), Lead Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Notice Of Supplemental Authority filed by Les Investissements Kiz Inc., UAT Trading Service, Inc.. (Strauss, Joel) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#187) NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company re #159 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BY ALL DEFENDANTS Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority in further support of Defendants Joint Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nussbaum, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
197 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIANDONG TANG. JAMES V. CONTINENZA waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (ECKLUND, DONALD) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIANDONG TANG. DAVID BULLWINKLE waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (ECKLUND, DONALD) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to Complaint and setting briefing schedule. Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint prior to appointment of lead Plaintiff; upon appointment, lead Plaintiff shall have 60 days to file an amended complaint; Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint within 60 days after filing; lead plaintiff shall have 60 days thereafter to oppose any motion; and Defendants shall have 30 days from the filing of lead plaintiff's opposition papers to file their reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/14/2020. (jdb) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE by DAVID BULLWINKLE, JAMES V. CONTINENZA, EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY. (BALDINI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY. (BALDINI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. BALDINI on behalf of DAVID BULLWINKLE, JAMES V. CONTINENZA, EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (BALDINI, STEPHEN) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification of TIANDONG TANG on behalf of TIANDONG TANG Re #1 Complaint. (CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to DAVID BULLWINKLE, JAMES V. CONTINENZA, EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11206517) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TIANDONG TANG. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from njd on 5/28/2021.] (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broward Motorsports Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SRR FORTESS CAPITAL, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company is a litigant