This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2021 at 07:05:36 (UTC).

Tanana Chiefs Conference v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Tanana Chiefs Conference filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04251

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanana Chiefs Conference

Defendants

Phillip Morris USA, Inc.

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Riaz Valani

JUUL Labs, Inc.

Nicholas Pritzker

Altria Group, Inc.

Hoyoung Huh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Elizabeth J. Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Reilly Todd Stoler

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Sarah Robin London

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. E-filer is reminded that the County Code in the case opening screen has been corrected to "US, Outside State" and NOT San Francsico as it re fers to plaintiff's county of residence. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Tanana Chiefs Conference. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Riaz Valani. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDIRECT FILE MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2913, Tanana Chiefs Conference v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-04251-WHO cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCases associated: Create association to 3:19-md-02913-WHO. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Tanana Chiefs Conference . (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Even t is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Tanana Chiefs Conference (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Redacted per court order MDL ECF No. 1277 against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., James Monsees, Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Riaz Valani ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16041273.). Filed byTanana Chiefs Conference. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dena' Nena' Henash d/b/a Tanana Chiefs Conference is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant