This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2020 at 08:17:38 (UTC).

TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE v. AZAR et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE filed an Other lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02902

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE

Defendants

MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE

ALEX M. AZAR, II

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lloyd B. Miller

Attorney at SONOSKY, CHAMBERS, SACHSE, MILLER & MONKMAN, LLP

725 East Firewood Lane, Suite 420

Anchorage, AK 99503

Rebecca A. Patterson

Attorney at SONOSKY, CHAMBERS, SACHSE, MILLER & MONKMAN, LLP

725 East Fireweed Lane, Suite 420

Anchorage, AK 99503

Defendant Attorney

Sian Jones

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit Return Receipt

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE served on 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Patterson on behalf of TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

5 #3

Certificate of Service

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Declaration of Rebecca A. Patterson

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rebecca A. Patterson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7706372. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca A. Patterson, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/13/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Michael Sherwin filed by TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE.(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE served on 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Patterson on behalf of TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE (Patterson, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. #5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Rebecca A. Patterson is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). #Click for Instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/1 3/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rebecca A. Patterson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7706372. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca A. Patterson, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/13/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Michael Sherwin filed by TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE.(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7697683) filed by TANANA CHIEFS CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-FY 2011 Alaska Tribal Health Compact, #2 Exhibit B-FY 2011-2013 Funding Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-2007 IHS Manual Part 6 Ch. 3, #4 Exhibit D-TCC FY 2013 Claim, #5 Exhibit E-IHS Response to TCC Claim, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Alex Azar, #8 Summons Michael Weahkee, #9 Summons William Barr)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dena' Nena' Henash d/b/a Tanana Chiefs Conference is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca A Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lloyd B. Miller