This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 08:25:15 (UTC).

Tamraz v. Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Tamraz filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Bakotic Pathology Associates, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia Bashant and William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Bashant

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaron Tamraz

Defendants

Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C. a Georgia Limited Liability Company doing business as Bako Pathology Associates

Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation

Does 1 Through 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James M Treglio

Mark D. Potter

Defendant Attorneys

Ian Charles Ballon

Rebekah Strawn Guyon

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Charles Ballon on behalf of Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C. (Ballon, Ian) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Strawn Guyon on behalf of Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C. (Guyon, Rebekah) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Guyon, Rebekah) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Pursuant to S.D. CAL. L.R. 7.2 by Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C.. (Guyon, Rebekah) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #5 ). Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 6/9/2022. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/27/22. (jmo) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Proof of Service

#8

(#8) Order Granting Joint Motion to Allow Filing of First Amended Complaint and to Extend Time to Respond (ECF No. #7 ). Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint no later than 6/21/22. Defendants shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint no later than 7/21/22. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/15/22. (jmo) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proof of Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First against All Defendants, filed by Aaron Tamraz. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Treglio, James) (dlg). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Granting Joint Motion to Allow Filing of First Amended Complaint and to Extend Time to Respond (ECF No. #7 ). Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint no later than 6/21/22. Defendants shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint no later than 7/21/22. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/15/22. (jmo) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Order Allowing: (1) Plaintiff To File First Amended Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief And (2) Extending Defendants Response Date by Aaron Tamraz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Treglio, James) **QC Mailer on 6/10/2022 re: not filing proposed order on docket and submit to Chambers (jmo). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #5 ). Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 6/9/2022. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/27/22. (jmo) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Pursuant to S.D. CAL. L.R. 7.2 by Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C.. (Guyon, Rebekah) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Guyon, Rebekah) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Strawn Guyon on behalf of Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C. (Guyon, Rebekah) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Charles Ballon on behalf of Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation, Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C. (Ballon, Ian) (jmo). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16840301.) filed by Bakotic Pathology Associates, L.L.C., Bako Pathology Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:22-cv-725-BAS-WVG. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(mef)(jrd) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less