This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2022 at 03:41:59 (UTC).

TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS v. EYELASHWORKS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against EYELASHWORKS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02346

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS

Defendants

EYELASHWORKS LLC

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Evan Carreon

Attorney at Higbee & Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive, Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

(#7) Notice of Settlement by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the notice of settlement #7 filed on 7/16/2021, the initial status conference set for 7/22/2021 is stricken and reset to 9/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747.If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date, the status hearing will be cancelled and the case will be closed. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(1A)(i) and the notice of voluntary dismissal #9 filed on 9/20/2021, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Telephone conference set for 9/21/2021 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(1A)(i) and the notice of voluntary dismissal #9 filed on 9/20/2021, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Telephone conference set for 9/21/2021 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the notice of settlement #7 filed on 7/16/2021, the initial status conference set for 7/22/2021 is stricken and reset to 9/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747.If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date, the status hearing will be cancelled and the case will be closed. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Settlement by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant EYELASHWORKS LLC (jg, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 7/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Joint status report due by 7/16/2021. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Interested Parties by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS for EYELASHWORKS LLC (Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18197312. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E Carreon