This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2023 at 09:39:24 (UTC).

Talley v. Attorney General's Office et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 Talley filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Attorney General's Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan E. Schwab. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01970

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan E. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quintez Talley

Labelle, PA 15450

Defendants

Attorney General's Office

Josh Shapiro

Kevin Bradford

United States of America

Judge Timothy J. Savage

Department of Corrections

Lt. Andrew Reber

C/O Costanzo

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Quintez Talley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aaa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (aaa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued and sent to Plaintiff. (aaa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#4

(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(lp) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

4 #1

IFP

#5

(#5) ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/24/2023. (mw) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#6

(#6) Certified MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quintez Talley.(sm) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the courts order (Doc. 5) of January 24, 2023, is VACATED. The Clerk of Court shall reopen the above-captioned action and thereafter reassign this case in accordance with this judicial districts case assignment policy. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/2/2023. (mw) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for all further proceedings. Honorable Christopher C. Conner no longer assigned to case.(ktt) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the courts order (Doc. 5) of January 24, 2023, is VACATED. The Clerk of Court shall reopen the above-captioned action and thereafter reassign this case in accordance with this judicial districts case assignment policy. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/2/2023. (mw) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Quintez Talley. (sm) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quintez Talley.(sm) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/24/2023. (mw) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Christopher C. Conner for all further proceedings. (jkc) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(lp) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued and sent to Plaintiff. (aaa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (aaa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Quintez Talley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aaa) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less