This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2023 at 08:35:33 (UTC).

TaldemL v. California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 TaldemL filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Haywood S Gilliam, Jr and PSLC CHC. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

Referral Judge

PSLC CHC

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Delano TaldemL

Delano James Tolden

Defendants

California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation

California Attorney General's Office Northern District

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE: Complaint on Form due by 3/13/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/13/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 03/06/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#9

(#9) COMPLAINT against California Attorney General's Office Northern District, California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation. Filed by Delano Taldem L. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

9 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Delano Taldeml (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) Modified on 3/16/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Delano Taldeml. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

11 #1

Envelope

#12

(#12) Received Document re #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Delano Taldeml. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2023: #2 Envelope) (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2023)

12 #1

Envelope

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/16/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/16/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Received Document re #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Delano Taldeml. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2023: #2 Envelope) (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Delano Taldeml. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Delano Taldeml (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) Modified on 3/16/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COMPLAINT against California Attorney General's Office Northern District, California Department of Correction and Rehabilitation. Filed by Delano Taldem L. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 03/06/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAdded AKA to plaintiff's mailing address.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/13/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE: Complaint on Form due by 3/13/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST the Court to Consider Delayed Time Filing by Delano TaldemL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2023) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less