This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:23:21 (UTC).

Talbott v. Credit Acceptance Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Talbott filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Credit Acceptance Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin C. Carlson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01939

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin C. Carlson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derrick Talbott

Landisville, PA 17538

Defendant

Credit Acceptance Corp.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Credit Acceptance Corp. lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Derrick Talbott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement, #3 Exhibit(s))(gs) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Statement

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

#2

(#2) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (gs) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#3

(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (gs) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Derrick Talbott - For the foregoing reasons, we will order that this case be transferred to theUnited States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 17, 2021. (kjn) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 17, 2021. (kjn) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 5:21-cv-05133, filed 11/17/2021. (jw) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 17, 2021. (kjn) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Derrick Talbott - For the foregoing reasons, we will order that this case be transferred to theUnited States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 17, 2021. (kjn) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (gs) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (gs) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Credit Acceptance Corp. lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Derrick Talbott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement, #3 Exhibit(s))(gs) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant