This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2021 at 09:54:12 (UTC).

Talbert v. Wetzel et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Talbert filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wetzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Malachy E Mannion and DB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01231

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

Referral Judge

DB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Talbert

Dallas, PA 18612

Defendants

John Wetzel

Christopher Oppman

Tabb Bickell

Tammy Ferguson

Kevin Ransom

Jason Bohinski

Michael Goyne

Susan Kuzminski

William Midlick

Giselle Malet

Lea Martin

Jacqueline Chakkan

Kimberlee Drum

Wellpath

Jorge Dominicis

Scott Prince

Centurion Medical

Erick Weinstein

Adam Glushakow

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Allison L. Deibert

Attorney at PA Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor, Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Ryan B Smith

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300, Ste 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Alexander R Ferrante

Attorney at Gold & Ferrante, P.C.

716 N. Bethlehem Pike, Suite 208

Lower Gwynedd, PA 19002

Cassidy L Neal

Attorney at Matis Baum O'Connor, P.C.

912 Fort Duquesne Blvd.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

4 #4

398 Forms

4 #3

Fed and Local Rules

4 #2

Instruction Sheet

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

RECEIPT

1 #1

Plaintiff cover letter

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander R Ferrante on behalf of Jorge Dominicis, Scott Prince, Wellpath (Ferrante, Alexander) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Pennsylvania State Attorney General on 8/27/21. (ga) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION For Emergency Relief, Oral Argument Required by Charles Talbert.(ga) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Kimberlee Drum served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Susan Kuzminski served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Lea Martin served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Officer Maciejczak served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Scott Prince served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Gina Harrison served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Talbert. Giselle Malet served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (ga) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles Talbert.(ep) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST for Update of Case by Charles Talbert. (ga) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ga) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2021) (ga). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2021) (ga). (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. The Complaint (Doc.1) is DEEMED filed. (See Order for complete details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 7/26/21. (ga) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Update of Case (copy of docket sheet sent on 7/19/21) by Charles Talbert. (ga) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketReceipt of payment from CHARLES TALBERT QA4727 in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE- NON-PRISONER. Transaction posted on 7/13/2021. Receipt number 333077171 processed by epetrosk. (jjs) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 form) (lp) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Talbert.(lp) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Talbert.(lp) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 333077171), filed by Charles Talbert. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff cover letter)(lp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2021: #2 RECEIPT) (lp). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Medical is a litigant

Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander R Ferrante

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison L. Deibert