This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2020 at 08:15:36 (UTC).

Talamantes v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Talamantes filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02015

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda L. Talamantes

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Vincent Hogan

Attorney at The Law Office of John V. Hogan

3465-B Lawrenceville-Suwanee Road

Suwanee, GA 30024

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Amanda L. Talamantes. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 5/18/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified mail return receipts)(Hogan, John) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General and U. S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 W. Barr - Attorney General, #2 B. Pak - U. S. Attorney)(eop) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Amanda L. Talamantes. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9685643) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less