This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2020 at 08:20:29 (UTC).

Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. v. Wyckoff et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Wyckoff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11818

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Johnathan Wyckoff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dale Margaret Cendali

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Joshua Levicoff Simmons

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Megan Leigh McKeown

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

609 Main St

Houston, TX 77002

Claudia Elizabeth Ray

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

153 East 53Rd Street

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

Leonard J French, Jr

Attorney at Leonard French

Po Box 37635 #75055

Philadelphia, PA 19101-0635

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Leonard French in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac

#18

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Take-Two Terms of Service

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Take-Two EULA

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - RDR2 Copyright Registration

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - RDR Copyright Registration

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - GTAV Copyright Registration

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: ( Motions due by 3/30/2020.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (ama) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: granting #24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The above schedule is adopted. No further extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. Johnathan Wyckoff answer due 3/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/13/2020) (ama) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Leonard J. French, Esq. dated February 13, 2020. Document filed by Johnathan Wyckoff..(French, Leonard) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: granting #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to March 6, 2020. The parties' joint submission is due February 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/28/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference or Appear Telephonically addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Leonard J. French, Esq. dated January 28, 2020. Document filed by Johnathan Wyckoff.(French, Leonard) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Johnathan Wyckoff answer due 2/17/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/16/2020) (rj) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, with Consent, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Leonard J. French, Esq. dated January 16, 2020. Document filed by Johnathan Wyckoff.(French, Leonard) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leonard John French Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/14/2020) (js) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Leonard John French Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18491074. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leonard John French Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18491074. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Johnathan Wyckoff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Leonard French in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(French, Leonard) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Leigh McKeown on behalf of Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (McKeown, Megan) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Levicoff Simmons on behalf of Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Simmons, Joshua) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claudia Elizabeth Ray on behalf of Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Ray, Claudia) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dale Margaret Cendali on behalf of Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johnathan Wyckoff, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Johnathan Wyckoff. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18371461)Document filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GTAV Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - RDR Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - RDR2 Copyright Registration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Take-Two EULA, #5 Exhibit 5 - Take-Two Terms of Service)(Cendali, Dale) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Take-Two Interactive Software Inc. is a litigant