This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2019 at 07:57:24 (UTC).

Takara v. Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Takara filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brooke Akemi Takara

Defendants

Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe

Arlette S. Harada

Ekimoto & Morris, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven K.S. Chung

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor, 521-9500, Fax: 541-9050

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael L. Iosua

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Timothy E. Ho

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

10 #2

AO 399- Waiver of Summons

10 #1

AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit

#10

9 #2

issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLC

9 #1

issued summons Arlette S. Harada

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure

#4

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • Docket(#14) EO: Counsel Steven K.S. Chung informs the Court that the parties have agreed on an extension of time for Defendants to answer and request a continuance of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. To allow parties sufficient time to complete their LR 26.1 conference, submit a report of the parties, and submit a scheduling conference statement, the request is hereby GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 10/07/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 09/30/2019.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ekimoto & Morris, LLC served on 7/10/2019 filed by Brooke Akemi Takara. (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add service date (cib). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Arlette S. Harada served on 7/10/2019 filed by Brooke Akemi Takara.. (Ho, Timothy) Modified to add service date on 7/23/2019 (cib). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe served ib 7/9/2019 filed by Brooke Akemi Takara. . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add service date (cib). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC, Arlette S. Harada. (Attachments: #1 issued summons Arlette S. Harada, #2 issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLC)(cib) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC, Arlette S. Harada, filed by Brooke Akemi Takara.(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00322-LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Brooke A. Takara. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, Arlette S. Harada ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2220974.), filed by Brooke A. Takara.(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L. Iosua

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy E. Ho