This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2019 at 06:53:05 (UTC).

Tairou v. Cannon et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 Tairou filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Cannon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mocktar A. Tairou

Folkston, GA 31537

Respondents

William Barr

Krystel Kyrsen

Al Cannon, Jr

SEAN GALLAGHER

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/5/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#19

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER incorporating herein by reference, the #11 Report and Recommendation and authorizing the Clerk to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 4/29/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 3/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/8/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Transferal of Case from District of South Carolina. (slt) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Case transfer in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 1:19-cv-00674. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Letter from Mocktar A. Tairou. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation placed in U.S. Mail to Mocktar A. Tairou. (lbak) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER incorporating herein by reference, the #11 Report and Recommendation and authorizing the Clerk to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 4/29/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Mocktar A. Tairou. (lbak) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 4/5/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Change of Address by Mocktar A. Tairou. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Mocktar A. Tairou. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#7) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX00080887. (lbak) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #5 Proper Form Order and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail to Mocktar A. Tairou. (lbak) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 3/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/8/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mocktar A. Tairou. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less